U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00852
  • Case Name: Serna v. BBVA USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 04, 2023: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 09, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • December 09, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 22, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 09, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • November 09, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • November 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.