U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01840-1
  • Case Name: USA v. De Los Santos-Toledo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 24, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of JERS Utilization]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 07, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.