U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00851
  • Case Name: Hernandez v. George et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 16, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 13, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 10, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.