U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01858-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tso
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 15, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 14, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.