U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01668-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez-Leyva
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 10, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 02, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 16, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 14, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.