U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00863
  • Case Name: Walden v. Dolgencorp, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • January 10, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 03, 2023: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 28, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 19, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 19, 2022: [Transmittal State Court Documents]
  • December 14, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 14, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • November 14, 2022: [Appendix/Supplement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.