U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00861
  • Case Name: Chavez v. Wexford Health Sources, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • May 02, 2025: [Dismiss Party]
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • March 28, 2025: [Dismiss Party]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.