U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00829
  • Case Name: Spurgeon v. Board of County Commissioners of the County of Grant et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • January 12, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 04, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 03, 2023: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.