U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-01849-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lucious
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 16, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 10, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 10, 2025: [Continue]
December, 2024
  • December 22, 2024: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 20, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 18, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.