U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00870
  • Case Name: Summit Lake Park Eagle Restoration Systems, LLC v. Lodging Advisory Rio Rancho Blvd. Deluxe, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order to Show Cause]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.