U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01511-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carrera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 17, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.