U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00872
  • Case Name: Gurule et al v. Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • December 28, 2022: [Vacate]
  • December 16, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 15, 2022: [Remand]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 28, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 17, 2022: [Errata]
  • November 16, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.