U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00874
  • Case Name: Gyan et al v. N/A Eagle Ranch-67 Limited Partnership et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Answer to Counterclaim]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 30, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • December 09, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2022: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • November 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 17, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.