U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00862
  • Case Name: Frank v. Conduent Business Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 05, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 03, 2023: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • January 02, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 19, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 18, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 17, 2022: [Jury Demand]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.