U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00876
  • Case Name: CROSS COUNTRY DAIRY et al v. Blinken et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • December 07, 2022: [Vacate]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Omnibus Hearing]
  • November 29, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • November 22, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • November 21, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 17, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.