U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00875
  • Case Name: NORTHRUP v. Young et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 18, 2022: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • November 17, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.