U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00878
  • Case Name: Solis v. Wexford Health Sources, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Approve Settlement]
October, 2024
  • October 25, 2024: [Appendix/Supplement]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • January 19, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 18, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 18, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 20, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 17, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.