U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00859
  • Case Name: Chavez v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 18, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.