U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00883
  • Case Name: SPRA Green Inc. v. Pruco Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Remand]
  • November 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 21, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.