U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00896
  • Case Name: 2 Kids, LLC et al v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 13, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 13, 2023: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • December 22, 2022: [Extend (other)]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.