U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00882
  • Case Name: Peppin v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 11, 2023: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • January 06, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 04, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 03, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 03, 2023: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.