U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00901
  • Case Name: Skinner v. Prummell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • May 05, 2025: [Letter]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 01, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Reopen Case]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 09, 2023: [Compel]
  • January 03, 2023: [Letter]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.