U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00880
  • Case Name: Miller-Albarez v. Heinrich
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • December 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 13, 2022: [Errata]
  • December 09, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.