U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00902
  • Case Name: Garnand v. Stoneworld Company, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Extend (other)]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • December 08, 2022: [Extend (other)]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Setting Briefing Schedule]
  • November 23, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.