U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00909
  • Case Name: Martinez Jr. v. Sandoval et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Letter]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Cure Defects]
  • November 28, 2022: [Proceed 28 U.S.C. 1915]
  • November 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.