U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00908
  • Case Name: Scott v. Metropolitan Detention Center
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 06, 2023: [Petition for 2241 Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 29, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order to Cure Defects]
November, 2022
  • November 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.