U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00910
  • Case Name: T-Mobile West Tower LLC et al v. Academy Medical Office LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Jury Demand]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 12, 2023: [Counterclaim]
  • January 11, 2023: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 23, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • December 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 28, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.