U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01863-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 19, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 19, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • December 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 19, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [In Limine]
  • December 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 09, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • December 09, 2022: [Witness List]
  • December 09, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • December 09, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 01, 2022: [Extend (other)]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 28, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.