U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00899
  • Case Name: Gonzales v. Stone Creek Operating, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 11, 2023: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • December 29, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • December 27, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 16, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 29, 2022: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.