U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00921
  • Case Name: Dillard Store Services, Inc. v. Winrock Partners LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 08, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 05, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 21, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 14, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 10, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Affidavit of Service]
  • January 19, 2023: [Affidavit of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.