U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00904
  • Case Name: Wrobel v. City of Santa Fe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 20, 2023: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 13, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.