U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01721-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramirez-Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 07, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric/Psychological Exam]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 08, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 06, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • December 06, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.