U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01980-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baca
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 26, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.