U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00927
  • Case Name: Snider et al v. Pilot Travel Centers, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 07, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.