U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00932
  • Case Name: Poole v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • December 21, 2022: [Vacate]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • December 20, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Summons Reissued]
  • December 07, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.