U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00898
  • Case Name: Spinarski et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 17, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 13, 2023: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Bifurcate]
  • January 10, 2023: [Bifurcate]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 09, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.