U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00929
  • Case Name: Ruiz v. Stallion Oilfield Services Limited Partnership et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.