U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00940
  • Case Name: Schmidt et al v. Aztec Municipal School District No. 2 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • December 14, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.