U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-02018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 14, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.