U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00966
  • Case Name: Fertitta v. Garland
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Response (when not to a motion)]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 05, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • January 04, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • January 03, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Association Dues Received]
  • December 21, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 21, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • December 20, 2022: [Appear]
  • December 20, 2022: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • December 20, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.