U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00967
  • Case Name: Trujillo v. Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • January 06, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2023: [Transmittal State Court Documents]
  • January 03, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Remand]
  • December 20, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • December 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.