U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-02052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 03, 2025: [Dismiss]
January, 2025
  • January 06, 2025: [Notice of Judgment]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 12, 2023: [CJA Appointment]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 28, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.