U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-02051-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Chavez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 12, 2023: [Discovery Order]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.