U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00968
  • Case Name: Castillo v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release of Funds]
  • April 29, 2025: [Release of Funds]
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 12, 2023: [Sanctions]
  • January 05, 2023: [Transmittal State Court Documents]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 21, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • December 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.