U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-02053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 13, 2025: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • May 12, 2025: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Text Only)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Strike]
  • January 18, 2023: [Bill of Particulars]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 04, 2023: [Discovery Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.