U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01908-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aragon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 26, 2025: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric/Psychological Treatment]
  • December 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 22, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.