U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00937
  • Case Name: Lopez et al v. Spur Energy Partners LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [Remand]
  • January 04, 2023: [Acknowledgment of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.