U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00986
  • Case Name: Waite v. Eduro Healthcare, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Status Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 22, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.