U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00983
  • Case Name: Medina et al v. Romero et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 20, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Extend (other)]
  • January 06, 2023: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • January 04, 2023: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.