U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00028
  • Case Name: Fisher v. Walmart
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 30, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 04, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.